Nadel, Maya (CPSO#: 97689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 410
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416)-285-3323
Fax: (416)-285-1825
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maya Nadel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nadel ( CPSO# 97689 )

Business Address:
410 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 285-3323

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAYA NADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015