Nadel, Mendel Robert (CPSO#: 25723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.R. Nadel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nadel ( CPSO# 25723 )

Business Address:
422 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 746-1955

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 8, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On April 13, 2018, Humber River Hospital (HRH) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective March 8, 2018, Dr. Robert Nadel voluntarily restricted his practice at HRH to performing elective caesarean sections for his remaining patients and to providing surgical assistance to obstetrician gynaecologists at HRH.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 18 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 30 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Nadel was not successful in obtaining a Clinical Supervisor and must cease
            to practise medicine effective June 15, 2018  (pursuant to s. (2) of the terms,
            conditions and limitations below).

            (1 of 2)  

            As from  12:01  a.m., May 30, 2018, by order of the Quality Assurance Committee
            of the College of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate  of registration held
            by Dr. Mendel Robert Nadel:

            Clinical Supervision

            (1)   As  of  June  15,  2018,  Dr.  Nadel  must  obtain a Clinical  Supervisor
                  ("Clinical Supervisor") who is acceptable to  the  College.  For a period
                  of six (6) months after he has obtained a Clinical Supervisor,  Dr. Nadel
                  may   only  practise  under  high-level  supervision  with  the  Clinical
                  Supervisor  ("high-level supervision"), subject to the exceptions set out
                  below. For the  duration of the period of high-level supervision, subject
                  to the exceptions  set  out  in  sections  (1)(a)  and  (1)(b) below, the
                  Clinical Supervisor shall be the Most Responsible Physician  ("MRP"),  as
                  that  term is defined in the Guidelines for College-Directed Supervision,
                  for all  patients  cared for by Dr. Nadel, and must be physically present
                  in the room with Dr.  Nadel  at  all  times while Dr. Nadel is engaged in
                  patient  care  and/or treatment.  The Clinical  Supervisor  shall  submit
                  weekly written reports  to  the  College.  The  two  exceptions  to  this
                  restriction are as follows:

                  (a)   Dr.  Nadel  may  perform elective caesarean sections independently,
                        only if the Clinical  Supervisor  has  reviewed  and  approved  the
                        timeliness  and  appropriateness of all elective caesarean sections
                        prior to Dr. Nadel performing such procedures; and 
                  
                  (b)   Dr.  Nadel may practice  as  a  surgical  assistant  of  a  surgeon
                        certified  by  the  Royal  College  of  Physicians  and Surgeons or
                        recognized  as  a  surgical  specialist  by the College ("Qualified
                        Surgeon"), only if:
                  
                        (i)   Dr. Nadel is not the MRP for any patient;
                        (ii)  Dr. Nadel provides no pre-operative  or  post-operative  care
                              whatsoever; and 
                        (iii) The Qualified Surgeon is always physically in attendance when
                              Dr.   Nadel  is  engaging  in  his  practice  as  a  surgical
                              assistant.
                  
            (2)   If Dr. Nadel is unable  to  obtain  a  Clinical  Supervisor as set out in
                  section (1) above, Dr. Nadel must cease practising  medicine immediately,
                  subject  to  the exceptions outlined above, until such  time  as  he  has
                  obtained a Clinical  Supervisor  acceptable  to  the College. For further
                  clarity, Dr. Nadel may practice as a surgical assistant,  as described in
                  section  (1)(b)  above,  notwithstanding  whether  he obtains a  Clinical
                  Supervisor. 

            Reassessment 

            (3)   At the end of the period of Clinical Supervision, Dr. Nadel shall undergo
                  a  reassessment  of  his  practice  by a College-approved  assessor.  The
                  reassessment will include observation of, among other things, Dr. Nadel's
                  surgical procedures. The results of the  Reassessment  will be considered
                  by the Quality Assurance Committee. 


            (2 of 2)

            As from September 16, 2010, the following is imposed as a term,  condition  and
            limitation  on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mendel Robert Nadel,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Nadel to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Effective  immediately,  Dr.  Mendel Robert Nadel shall not engage in any
                  professional encounters with female  patients in any jurisdiction, unless
                  the patient encounter takes place  in  the presence of a female regulated
                  health professional.
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Oct 2003
Summary:

 On October 24, 2003, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Nadel to have committed an act of professional 
 misconduct in that, he interrupted or terminated his relationship with a patient during delivery, which 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. 
  
 The Committee ordered the following penalty: 
-Dr. Nadel attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
register;  
-The Registrar suspend Dr. Nadel’s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months; the 
suspension is to be suspended if Dr. Nadel complies with the following terms and conditions within six 
(6) months from today’s date: 
-Dr. Nadel undertakes at his own expense an assessment by the Quality Assurance Committee (Q.A.C.), 
co-operates with their work and abides by the Q.A.C.’s recommendations and complies with any terms, 
conditions and limitations which the Q.A.C. may impose on his certificate of registration. 
 -Dr. Nadel undertakes at his own expense the communications course offered by the College. 
 -Dr. Nadel pay a portion of the College’s costs, fixed in the amount of $2500.00. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 16, 2003

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)