Nader, Maya (CPSO#: 95978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Montreal, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Centre at 410
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
410 Sherbourne Street, 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 867-3728
Fax: 416-867-3726
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAYA NADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2013