Nadjafabadi Farahani, Pendar (CPSO#: 81711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
611 Holly Avenue, Suite 103
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone: (905) 878-0086
Fax: (905)-878-1562
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

400 Scott Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 3W4
Canada
Phone: 905-937-0000
Fax: 905-937-0030
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Canada
Phone: 905-829-2826
Fax: 905-829-2846
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadjafabadi Farahani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nadjafabadi Farahani ( CPSO# 81711 )

Business Address:
400 Scott Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 3W4
Phone Number: (905) 937-0000

Business Address:
2015 Kingsridge Drive
Suite 6
Oakville ON  L6M 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 465-3739

Business Address:
103 - 611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 878-0086

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PENDAR NADJAFABADI FARAHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADJAFABADI FARAHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 15 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2009 to 10 Jan 2010
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2015