Nadkarni, Neelesh Kishore (CPSO#: 79933)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Konkani, Marathi

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2014