Naeem, Nauman (CPSO#: 94621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Urdu

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1723 Kipling Avenue, Suite 2G
Etobicoke ON  M9R 4E1
Phone: (647) 748-8011
Fax: (647) 748-8012
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 4162421000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nauman Naeem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Naeem ( CPSO# 94621 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
2G - 1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 4E1
Phone Number: (647) 748-8011

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Jun 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAUMAN NAEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAEEM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2010