Naessens, Veronique (CPSO#: 91968)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Jul 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 17 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014