Nag, Shudeshna (CPSO#: 80819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kindercare Pediatrics
Suite 301-491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kidcrew Medical
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Canada
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: (416) 689-2371
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shudeshna Nag Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nag ( CPSO# 80819 )

Business Address:
Kindercare Pediatrics
301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 848-7665

Business Address:
Kidcrew Medical
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone Number: (416) 654-5437

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHUDESHNA NAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2008