Nagai, Mary Kikumi (CPSO#: 75450)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008