Nagarajan, Naveen Parasu (CPSO#: 85189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Juravinski Campus
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42562
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON
L8J 3W2
Hamilton ON  L8V 4T1
Canada
Phone: (905) 387-4551
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-0130
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road, Suite 103
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-2066
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Brantford Medical Imaging
260 Lynden Rd- #102
Brantford ON  N3T 5L8
Canada
Phone: 519 756 9889
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Canada
Phone: 905 945 2253
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: 519 464 4400
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naveen Parasu Nagarajan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nagarajan ( CPSO# 85189 )

Business Address:
HHSC Juravinski Campus
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVEEN PARASU NAGARAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGARAJAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 13 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 14 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009