Naghdi, Reza (CPSO#: 110771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Isfahan University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of General Internal
Medicine
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Iran

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REZA NAGHDI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NAGHDI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. NAGHDI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NAGHDI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. NAGHDI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. NAGHDI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. NAGHDI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 22 Nov 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018