Naguib Khela, Sherine Amin Sobhy (CPSO#: 95227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit # 16
St. George Medical Center
585 Ontario Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2N2
Phone: (905) 693 0044
Fax: (905) 693 8600
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit # 3
5980 Churchill Meadows Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 7M5
Canada
Phone: (905) 814 1342
Fax: (905) 814 8724
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sherine Naguib Khela Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Naguib Khela ( CPSO# 95227 )

Business Address:
5980 Churchill Meadows Boulevard
Unit 3
Mississauga ON  L5M 7M5
Phone Number: (905) 814-1342

Business Address:
16 - 585 Ontario Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2N2
Phone Number: (905) 693-0044

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERINE AMIN SOBHY NAGUIB KHELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGUIB KHELA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013