Nahas, Richard (CPSO#: 72330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
942 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z9
Phone: (613) 727-7246
Fax: (613) 727-7247
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Nahas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nahas ( CPSO# 72330 )

Business Address:
942 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z9
Phone Number: (613) 727-7246

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 13 Jul 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Naha’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Nahas sexually abused Patient A and engaged disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards Patient A during a medical appointment in approximately November 2016, including by touching her body, including her genital area, in a manner that was sexual and/or inappropriate, by breaching boundaries, and by making inappropriate remarks and remarks of a sexual nature towards Patient A.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., July 13, 2018, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Richard Nahas:

            Practice Monitor and Patient Log

            (i)   Dr. Nahas shall not engage in any professional encounters in which he
                  provides manipulation, mobilization or massage of the soft tissues and
                  joint structures, including but not limited to myofascial release
                  ("manual therapy"), acupuncture, or injections of any kind (the
                  "Professional Encounter") with patients of any age in any jurisdiction,
                  unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence
                  of and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated
                  health professional acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor"),
                  and unless the other requirements provided in the Order are fulfilled.
                  For further clarity, Dr. Nahas may not be alone with any patient, for any
                  length of time, during any Professional Encounter, whether or not the
                  parent or guardian of the patient is also present;

            (ii)  At all times, Dr. Nahas shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:

                  (a)   Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                        undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                  (b)   Remain present at all times during all Professional Encounters with
                        all patients;
                  
                  (c)   Carefully observe all of Dr. Nahas's Professional Encounters with
                        patients including, but not limited to, physical and internal
                        examinations.  It is Dr. Nahas's obligation to ensure that the
                        Practice Monitor's view of all of his Professional Encounters with
                        patients, including physical and internal examinations, is
                        unobstructed at all times.  
                  
                  (d)   Refrain from performing other functions, except those required in
                        the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "B" to the
                        Order, while observing Dr. Nahas in all his Professional Encounters
                        with patients;
                  
                  (e)   Maintain a log (the "Log") of all Professional Encounters with
                        patients in the form attached as Appendix "C" to the Order;
                  
                  (f)   Initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted
                        in the Log; and
                  
                  (g)   Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis;
                  
            (iii) Dr. Nahas shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make
                  it available to the College upon request.




            Informed Consent for Manual Therapy form

            (iv)  Dr. Nahas shall obtain an executed Informed Consent for Manual Therapy,
                  in the form attached at Appendix "D" to the Order, from every patient to
                  whom he provides manual therapy.  Dr. Nahas shall not provide further
                  manual therapy to those patients to whom he has already provided manual
                  therapy in the past until the patients execute an Informed Consent for
                  Manual Therapy.  Dr. Nahas shall not perform manual therapy on patients
                  on whom he has not previously performed manual therapy until the patients
                  execute an Informed Consent for Manual Therapy.

            Notification of Practice Locations

            (v)   Dr. Nahas shall inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practices or has privileges including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice
                  Location(s)"), within five (5) days of the Order.  Going forward, he
                  shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                  five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

            Posting a Sign and Translations

            (vi)  Dr. Nahas shall post a sign all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                  consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                  and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Appendix "E" to the
                  Order that states: "Dr. Nahas must not provide manipulation, mobilization
                  or massage of the soft tissues and joint structures, including but not
                  limited to myofascial release ("manual therapy"), acupuncture, or
                  injections of any kind, to patients of any age, unless in the continuous
                  presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor
                  acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr.
                  Nahas must not be alone with any patient while he is providing manual
                  therapy, acupuncture, or injections. Further information may be found on
                  the College website at www.cpso.on.ca";

            (vii) Dr. Nahas shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which he provides services, of the sign described in (v) above, in all
                  waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his
                  Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                  attached hereto as Appendix "E" to the Order; and

            (viii)Dr. Nahas shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (vii)
                  above to the College within 30 days of the date of the Order.

            Notifying Patients

            (ix)  Dr. Nahas shall ensure that each patient with whom he has a Professional
                  Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional Encounter, of
                  the details of the restriction described in (i), above; and

            (x)   With respect to patients that are scheduled at least seven (7) days in
                  advance, Dr. Nahas shall ensure that each patient is directly notified,
                  within seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details
                  of the restriction described in (i) above.

            Monitoring

            (xi)  Dr. Nahas shall consent to the College's making appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr.
                  Nahas's compliance with the terms of the Order and shall promptly sign
                  such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions;

            (xii) Dr. Nahas shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor Dr. Nahas's compliance with the terms of
                  the Order;

            (xiii)Dr. Nahas shall consent to the College's providing any and all
                  information to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to assist the Practice Monitor in fulfilling their
                  Undertaking and in order to monitor Dr. Nahas's compliance with the terms
                  of the Order;

            (xiv)  Dr. Nahas shall consent to all Practice Monitors' disclosing to the
                  College, and to one another, any information relevant to the Order,
                  relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's Undertaking and/or
                  relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Nahas's compliance with the
                  Order; and

            (xv)  Dr. Nahas shall consent to the College's providing the Order to any
                  Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location where he practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of
                  Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the
                  College has that led to the Order and/or any information arising from the
                  monitoring of his compliance with the Order.