Naher, Monzur (CPSO#: 79729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Dhaka, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 439-1558
Fax: (519) 439-3184
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Monzur Naher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Naher ( CPSO# 79729 )

Business Address:
Suite 408
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone Number: (519) 439-1558

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jan 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONZUR NAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2006