Naidoo, Niren (CPSO#: 91802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital Oullette
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4401
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6124 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8T 1E6
Canada
Phone: (519) 915-9494
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

2464 Howard Avenue, Suite 106
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
Phone: (226) 782-7246
Fax: (226) 783-2273
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naidoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Naidoo ( CPSO# 91802 )

Business Address:
106 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (226) 782-7246

Business Address:
6124 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8T 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 915-9494

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIREN NAIDOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIDOO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2010