Nair, Girish Madhavan (CPSO#: 78128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil, Urdu

Education:Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart
Institute
Room H 1285 B
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7272
Fax: (613) 696-7123
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Girish M. Nair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Nair ( CPSO# 78128 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 16 Jun 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Girish Madhavan Nair may practise medicine independently in cardiology.