Nairn, Travis Kane (CPSO#: 72451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GBHS -Owen Sound
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2345
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Centre for Personal Enhancement
250 10th St E
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1S4
Canada
Phone: (519) 371-1008
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

GBHS - Meaford
229 Nelson Street W
Meaford ON  N4L1A3
Canada
Phone: 5195381311
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Travis K. Nairn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nairn ( CPSO# 72451 )

Business Address:
The Centre for Personal Enhancement
250 10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1S4
Phone Number: (519) 371-1008

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRAVIS KANE NAIRN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIRN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 10 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Jul 2010 to 22 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000