Nakamura, Yoshitsugu (CPSO#: 94607)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ehime Unviersity, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Nov 2010 to 14 Dec 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 05 Oct 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2012