Nakhla, Meranda Michel (CPSO#: 75198)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meranda Nakhla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 2011