Nambiar, Sindhu (CPSO#: 89660)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:Calicut University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hosptial
Department of Internal Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2008 to 01 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Sindhu Nambiar may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine as
            a Hospitalist, only.