Nanaya, Neil Ponnettira (CPSO#: 86003)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Aug 2006 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Feb 2008 to 05 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 29 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013