Nandagopal, Meena (CPSO#: 74465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Jan 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam, Tamil, Telugu

Education:University of Madras, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Chedoke/McMaster Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1200 Main Street West MDCL 2110
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75171
Fax: (905) 523-1224
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Nandagopal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nandagopal ( CPSO# 74465 )

Business Address:
HHSC Chedoke/McMaster Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
1200 Main Street West MDCL 2110
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 25 Jan 2002 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 10 Jan 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jan 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Meena Nandagopal may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department  of Anaesthesia,  McMaster  University,   in  which  Dr.
                        Nandagopal holds  a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements  of
                        her appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  will automatically expire when Dr. Nandagopal no longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.