Nandra, Sukhjeen Kaur (CPSO#: 91161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Health Services Georgetown
c/o Department of Family Medicine
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: 905-873-0111 Ext. 8232
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

32-1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Canada
Phone: 905-335-1888
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

2225 Erin Mills Parkway #183
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Canada
Phone: (905) 823-0223
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2227 South Millway #303
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: 905 569 7007
Fax: (905) 569-7056
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 207
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Canada
Phone: 905 631-2080
Fax: 905 635-6215
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

202 - 710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Canada
Phone: (905) 607-0022
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 304-0062
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 6G3
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-9030
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sukhjeen Nandra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nandra ( CPSO# 91161 )

Business Address:
Halton Health Services Georgetown
Department of Anaesthesiology
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
7-10 - 3095 Glen Erin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1J3
Phone Number: (905) 607-0022

Business Address:
202 - 710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Phone Number: (905) 607-0022

Business Address:
1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 304-0062

Business Address:
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 6G3
Phone Number: (905) 790-9030

Business Address:
Suite 303
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-7007

Business Address:
Suite 32
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 335-1888

Business Address:
Suite 183
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Business Address:
A-7
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUKHJEEN KAUR NANDRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANDRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012