Nanji, Sulaiman (CPSO#: 87334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
2.055 Burr 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3534
Fax: (613) 548-2500
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Nanji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nanji ( CPSO# 87334 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SULAIMAN NANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007