Naom, Nashwan Albeer Ibrahim (CPSO#: 81789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Erie Shores Healthcare- Leamington
Department of Internal Medicine
194 Talbot Street West 3rd Floor
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 326-3330
Fax: (519) 326-0104
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Naom ( CPSO# 81789 )

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
3rd Floor
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-3330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASHWAN ALBEER IBRAHIM NAOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAOM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2004 to 27 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2008