Naoum, Susanne (CPSO#: 90621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Manitou Crescent West
Amherstview ON  K7N 1S3
Phone: (613) 389-1604
Fax: (613) 384-7359
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Naoum and M. Khokhotva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khokhotva ( CPSO# 88819 )
Dr. S. Naoum ( CPSO# 90621 )

Business Address:
18 Manitou Crescent West
Amherstview ON  K7N 1S3
Phone Number: (613) 389-1604

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSANNE NAOUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAOUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011