Naran, Navyn (CPSO#: 102254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Oct 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tufts University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
pouncey tract road
Glen Allen VA  23059
United States
Phone: (203) 507-1355

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record from Dr. Naran's previous practice location at 206 - 6453 Morrison Streetin Niagara Falls, Ontario, may contact: Safe Stor Records Management 2704 Hwy 20 Fonthill ON L0S 1E6 Tel: 905-892-0010 Fax: 905-892-9465 Patients may also send a written request to: drnavynnaran@gmail.com. Patients are advised not to include any sensitive information via email.
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York
USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Oct 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Oct 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Navyn Naran may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.