Narang, Indra (CPSO#: 81903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Mar 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Wales, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Respiratory Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6346
Fax: (416) 813-6246
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Mar 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2004 to 04 Nov 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Indra Narang may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Narang holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Narang no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.