Narayan, Badrinath (CPSO#: 94874)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Mar 2011 to 10 Apr 2011
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 11 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2014