Narayansingh, Marc Jevan (CPSO#: 89662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3N5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7547
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TSPC, 123 Edward St
Suite 1011
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416)-813-2277
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Malvern Sleep Clinic
1371 Nielsen Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 282-9119
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Narayansingh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narayansingh ( CPSO# 89662 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Malvern Sleep Clinic
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 282-9119

Business Address:
Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Suite 1011
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC JEVAN NARAYANSINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYANSINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2008 to 29 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010