Narula, Neeraj (CPSO#: 91106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main Street West
Room HSC 3V28
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 74430
Fax: (905) 523-6048
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neeraj Narula Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Narula ( CPSO# 91106 )

Business Address:
GI Health Centre
Suite 32
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 335-1888

Business Address:
Room HSC 3V28
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEERAJ NARULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARULA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013