Nascimento Junior, Bartolomeu Antonio (CPSO#: 84107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Feb 2013

Expiry Date:  24 Feb 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Feb 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 5850
Fax: (416) 480-5851
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 25 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2006 to 26 May 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Feb 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Feb 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Bartolomeu Antonio Nascimento Junior may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is approved by the Chair, Division of General
                        Surgery, Department of Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Nascimento Junior holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of registration automatically expires seven years  from
                  the date of issuance  or  when Dr. Nascimento Junior  no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report indicating  that  Dr.  Nascimento
                        Junior's   clinical  performance,   knowledge,   skill,   judgment,
                        professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual  report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr.  Nascimento  Junior's
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  February  25,  2013.   In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not  extended  by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on February 24, 2020.