Naser, Mohamed Sadiq Mohamed (CPSO#: 97198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Peshawar, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prince County Hospital
65 Roy Boates Avenue
Summerside PE  C1N 2A9
Phone: (902) 438-4200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 01 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED SADIQ MOHAMED NASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 24 Apr 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2017