Nash, Stephen Harold (CPSO#: 65312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Wilson Site
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 4162421000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dixe X-Ray
Columbus Medical Arts Building
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Canada
Phone: (905) 850-7478
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Nash Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nash ( CPSO# 65312 )

Business Address:
Dixie X-Ray
Columbus Medical Arts Building
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 850-7478

Business Address:
2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 745-8050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN HAROLD NASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1993