Nasr, Ahmed Lofty (CPSO#: 80110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatric Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Nasr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nasr ( CPSO# 80110 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatric Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 28 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED LOFTY NASR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 07 Nov 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 09 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 25 Aug 2004
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2011