Nasreen, Ruksana (CPSO#: 81378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Dhaka, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1653 Richmond Street
London ON  N6G 0V1
Phone: (519) 850-3800
Fax: (519) 850-5099
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ruksana Nasreen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nasreen ( CPSO# 81378 )

Business Address:
1653 Richmond Street
London ON  N6G 0V1
Phone Number: (519) 850-3800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUKSANA NASREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2008