Nasruddin, Nas Shazil Amri Bin (CPSO#: 94512)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universiti Kebangsaan Malaysia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 10 Dec 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 11 Dec 2010 to 17 Oct 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2011