Nathens, Avery (CPSO#: 62197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D574
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4711
Fax: (416) 480-4925
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avery B. Nathens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nathens ( CPSO# 62197 )

Business Address:
Suite D574
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4711


Corporation Name: Brenneman Chu Tien Tremblay Nathens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chu ( CPSO# 62432 )
Dr. F. Brenneman ( CPSO# 59446 )
Dr. A. Nathens ( CPSO# 62197 )
Dr. L. Tremblay ( CPSO# 63991 )
Dr. H. Tien ( CPSO# 65162 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite H186
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVERY NATHENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATHENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2006