Natsheh, Adam (CPSO#: 77692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4A 2V6
Phone: (416) 750-8400
Fax: (416) 750-1091
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
R K S Dermatology Centre
5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 7546
Fax: (416) 323-6236
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Natsheh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Natsheh ( CPSO# 77692 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
302 - 1448 Lawrence Avenue East
North York ON  M4Z 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 750-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM NATSHEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATSHEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007