Natuik, Shannon Allison (CPSO#: 89135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alexandra Marine and
General Hospital
120 Napier St
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Canada
Phone: (519) 524-8323
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Maitland Manor
290 South Street
Goderich ON  N7A4G6
Canada
Phone: 519-524-7324
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Natuik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Natuik ( CPSO# 89135 )

Business Address:
290 South Street
Goderich ON  N7A 4G6
Phone Number: (519) 524-7324

Business Address:
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-7586

Business Address:
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON ALLISON NATUIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATUIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010