Navarro Burgos, Jose Benjamin (CPSO#: 94742)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Juan N. Corpas, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2011 to 01 Apr 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Apr 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012