Nayar, Ajay (CPSO#: 93475)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical Academy of Silesia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Aug 2013 to 03 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 04 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ajay Nayar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 14, 2017:

Dr. Nayar is not a member of the College. He held a certificate of registration authorizing postgraduate education in Ontario between July 1, 2010 and June 30, 2014.

The College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Nayar engaged in professional misconduct. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Nayar has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario. No referral has been made to the Discipline Committee.
Download Full Document (PDF)