Nayar-Kingwell, Sunita Maria (CPSO#: 77520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: Nayar, Sunita Maria (used until: 18 Sep 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Active Care Carlingwood
Suite 35B
2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H2
Phone: (613) 761-6777
Fax: (613) 761-7744
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Kingwell and Nayar-Kingwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nayar-Kingwell ( CPSO# 77520 )
Dr. S. Kingwell ( CPSO# 77515 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Paediatrics
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Active Care Medical
Unit 35B
2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1M2
Phone Number: (613) 761-6777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNITA MARIA NAYAR-KINGWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYAR-KINGWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 14 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 2004 to 14 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 2005 to 14 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010