Naylor, Caitlin Patricia (CPSO#: 96020)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Manotick Medical Clinic, 5230 Mitch Owens Road, Ottawa, ON, K4M 1B2
Date Received: 04 Aug 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2016