Naymark, Sharon Ilana (CPSO#: 79449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

27 Roncesvalles Ave, Suite 405
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 516-4111
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naymark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Naymark ( CPSO# 79449 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 516-4111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON ILANA NAYMARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYMARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008