Nayyer, Habiba Mariam (CPSO#: 96241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-6400
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HABIBA MARIAM NAYYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Oct 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016