Ndubisi, Chukwulo Christopher (CPSO#: 97315)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.C. Ndubisi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2016

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 15 Mar 2016 to 18 Jul 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 19 Jul 2016 to 14 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2016