Neighbour, Helen (CPSO#: 91676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Firestone Institute for
Respiratory Health
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34324
Fax: (905) 521-6183
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen Neighbour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Neighbour ( CPSO# 91676 )

Business Address:
Firestone Institute for Respiratory Health
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Helen Neighbour may practise medicine independently in respirology.