Neilsen, Philip David (CPSO#: 74139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexandra Marine and General Hospit
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone: 519 524 8689 Ext. 5361
Fax: (519) 524 8513
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip D. Neilsen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Neilsen ( CPSO# 74139 )

Business Address:
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8689

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP DAVID NEILSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEILSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1999