Nel, Pierre Robert (CPSO#: 85354)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cape Town, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008